Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. Stillwater Farms et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Defendant: Stillwater Farms and Roger Childress
Case Number: 5:2010cv00124
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT finding that pltf is entitled to $119,925.87 with interest for breach of the seven installment sale contracts, late fees, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/6/10. (vjt)
September 23, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re attorney's fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/23/10. (bkp)
August 18, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Default Judgment on liability against each deft; and directing plaintiff to submit a brief on the issue of damages by 5 p.m., Thursday, September 2, 2010, and defts to respond by 5 p.m., Thursday, September 16, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/18/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc v. Stillwater Farms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc
Represented By: Blair Beavers Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillwater Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?