Rushing v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Darnell Rushing
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00127
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 20 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/15/12. (vjt)
April 19, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Objections to R&R due 5/7/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/19/12. (vjt)
June 4, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Response to Habeas Petition: Petitioner is informed of his opportunity to reply to this response within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/4/10. (bkp)
April 29, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; and directing the respondent to file a responsive pleading within 20 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?