Tillman v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Willie Tillman, Jr
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00132
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/10/11. (vjt)
March 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/14/11. (kpr)
July 27, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration re 15 Order on Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/27/10. (bkp)
June 4, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Response to Habeas Petition: Petitioner is informed of his opportunity to reply to this response within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/4/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Tillman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?