Green v. Gober et al

Plaintiff: Michael Green
Defendant: Mark Gober and Susan Potts
Case Number: 5:2010cv00134
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that Mr. Greens claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment is in favor of the Defendant, Susan Potts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/20/11. (hph)
March 10, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defts' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; Mr. Green is permitted to proceed on his deliberate indifference claim against deft Potts in her individual capacity only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/10/11. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 35 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/5/10. (vjt)
September 3, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the evidentiary hearing scheduled for April 6, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. will be conducted as a bench trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/3/10. (bkp)
June 7, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Gober and Potts, and the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the complaint and amended complaint with any attachments and a summons on these defts through the Drew County Sheriff's Department, 210 South Main, Monticello, AR 71655, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Gober et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?