Roddy v. Phieffer et al

Plaintiff: Troy Roddy
Defendant: Michael Phieffer, Connie Hubbard, Donna Gordon, Ifediora Nnamoi, Lisa Hall and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2010cv00140
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 145 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 136 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Objections to R&R due 4/25/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/11. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 75 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), deft Ifediora is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to a lack of service; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; Nnamdi Ifediora terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
August 30, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 40 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, and deft Phieffer is voluntarily dismissed from this action without prejudice; Michael Phieffer terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/30/10. (vjt)
June 17, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, Deft CMS is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to pltf's failure to state a viable claim against it; Correctional Medical Services terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/10. (vjt)
June 14, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 4 Motion for TRO is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roddy v. Phieffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Phieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ifediora Nnamoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?