Curry v. Fread et al

Plaintiff: Carl Curry
Defendant: Robbie Fread, Glen Pitts and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2010cv00154
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 48 Order entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, AND ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/12/2011. (dmn)
September 1, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's negligence claim against deft Pitts without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/1/10. (bkp)
July 21, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the Arkansas County Jail Insurance Company with prejudice; and directing the plaintiff to file his amended complaint within 15 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/21/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Fread et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?