Winston v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Defendant: Wendy L Kelly, Jan Alexanden, James Blackmon, Robert W Rectenwald, Marie Austin, Rory Griffin, Crystal Woods, Larry Norris, Ella Taylor, Charlote Green, Roland Anderson and Barry Greenlee
Case Number: 5:2010cv00180
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 183 Report and Recommendations in their entirety as to Dr. Anderson and in part as to Nurse Taylor; defts' motions for summary judgment 168 and 171 are GRANTED; pltf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/13. (vjt)
February 15, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 156 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Jan Alexander, James Blackmon, Robert Rectenwald, and Marie Austin are dismissed; pltf's claims against Crystal Wood are not dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/15/13. (vjt)
August 24, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 128 Motion for Reconsideration re 124 Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/24/12. (kpr)
August 3, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 111 Second Motion for Default Judgment against Barry Greenlee. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/12. (vjt)
August 1, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER approving 109 Partial Report and Recommendations with additional comments; dismissing Greenlee from this action; denying as moot 86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; and, denying as moot 96 Motion for Default Judgment against Greenlee. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/01/2012. (jak)
August 8, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 14 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's medical classification claim against Green is dismissed, and pltf's claim of deliberate indifference to serious medical needs against Green, Kelly, and Norri s are dismissed; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and complaint on defts Anderson and Blackmon without prepayment of fees and costs; this action is remanded to Magistrate Judge Volpe for further proceedings with respect to the claims re statute of limitations. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/8/11. (vjt)
March 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Alexanden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Rectenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlote Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?