Briley v. Tyler et al

Plaintiff: Eddie E Briley, Jr
Defendant: Tyler, Ed Adams, Bunting and Johnson
Case Number: 5:2010cv00182
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/6/12. (kpr)
October 27, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing John Andrew Ellis, P.O. Box 798, Bryant, AR 72089-0798 to represent Eddie Briley, Jr. in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is directed to send counsel and Plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/27/11. (kpr)
September 29, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 39 Partial Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/29/11. (kpr)
November 1, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 MOTION for Discovery filed by Eddie E Briley, Jr: This motion is actually a request for discovery and should be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie E Briley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?