Obama v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, James Shipman, Robert D Sanderlin and Gaylon Rex Lay
Case Number: 5:2010cv00201
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Ishmael Obama's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/11. (hph)
November 23, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 55 Magistrate Judge Deere's partial recommended disposition as its own; granting 54 Obama's motion to amend; dismissing his offical capacity claims against Sanderlin; and directing Obama to file his amended complaint by 11/23/10. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/23/10. (hph)
September 29, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 31 Magistrate Judge Beth Deere's proposed recommended disposition; and denying 28 Obama's motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/10. (hph)
August 13, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Judge Deere's recommended disposition; and dismissing, without prejudice, Obama's claims against Ray Hobbs, Gaylon Lay, and James Shipman. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/10. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obama v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Sanderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Rex Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?