Akins v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tony Akins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2010cv00204
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 4/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 3/17/11. (vjt)
February 14, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 3/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/14/11. (vjt)
January 11, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 2/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/11/11. (vjt)
December 10, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 15 Motion for Extension of Time to file appeal brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/10/10. (vjt)
November 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 12/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/8/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Akins
Represented By: Mark B. Chadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?