Briley v. Roberson et al

Plaintiff: Eddie E Briley, Jr
Defendant: Garald Roberson, Greg Bolin, Tyra Tylor and Edward Adams
Case Number: 5:2010cv00219
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition, dismissing claims against defts as set forth herein; and dismissing all claims against deft Roberson. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/10. (bkp)
November 3, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Reconsideration re 16 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff is directed to respond, within 114 days from the failing of this order, to the partial report and recommendations of the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/10. (bkp)
October 6, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 16 ORDER re 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/10. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing pltf's claims of denial of legal materials against defts Tylor, E. Adams and Cpl. Adams; dismissing claims of use of force against defts Tylor, E. Adams, Williams, and Roberts, and dismissing all claims against deft Robinson. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/10. (bkp)
August 4, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to the plaintiff an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/4/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Roberson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie E Briley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garald Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?