Henderson v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Mark Henderson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Larry May, William Straughn, Steve Outlaw, Terry Murphy and David White
Case Number: 5:2010cv00221
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 85 and granting defts' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/23/11. (kpr)
September 20, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 83 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 72 Motion and 74 Corrected Motion for Injunctive Relief, which the Court construes as Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/20/11. (vjt)
March 4, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 44 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/4/11. (vjt)
January 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 34 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 22 Motion for TRO, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/24/11. (vjt)
November 22, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety and dismissing Defendants Hobbs and May from this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/2010. (thd)
October 8, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 7 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/8/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?