Staley v. May et al

Plaintiff: Albert J Staley
Defendant: Larry D May, Suzanne Hixson, Harold Erwine and Debbie Wise
Case Number: 5:2010cv00249
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 45 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; this action is hereby STAYED pending disposition of State of Arkansas v. Albert J. Staley, in the Circuit Court of Randolph County, Arkansas, No. CV-2009-172; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action administratively. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/28/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry D May. The motion to dismiss will be construed as a motion for summary judgment and the parties shall have 10 days from the date of this Order in which to present any additional material pertinent to such motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/22/11. (kpr)
August 4, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Hixson, Erwin, and Wise are dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/11. (vjt)
October 18, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 11 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice for failure to state a claim; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staley v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert J Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Erwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?