Poland v Ford et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Frederick Poland
Defendant: Donny Ford, Paul Owen, Steward, Does and Jack Wheeler
Case Number: 5:2010cv00263
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the plaintiff's attendance at a settlement conference on May 16, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 4B, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, AR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/3/13. (kpr)
July 13, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing James H. Phillips, 111 Center Street, Suite 1200, Little Rock, AR 72201-3408, to represent plaintiff Wayne Poland in all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/13/12. (kpr)
June 11, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 123 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' motion for partial summary judgment 106 is GRANTED, and the following claims are dismissed: official capacity, verbal harassment, conditions of confinement, and deliberate indifference with respect to pltf's urinary voiding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/11/12. (vjt)
March 22, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 117 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice, for failure to prosecute; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/22/12. (vjt)
February 15, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 104 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Wayne Frederick Poland. Defendants shall file a response within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/15/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 106 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/11. (kpr)
July 27, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 76 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Martindale and Steward are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from pltf's complaint, for failure to serve; Christal Martindale and Timothy Steward terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/11. (vjt)
May 18, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide present addresses on defts Timothy Steward and Christal Martindale within 10 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/18/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Donny Ford; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on deft Ford without prepayment of fees therefor. Plaintiff shall file a new address for defts Timothy Steward and Christal Martindale within 15 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/24/11. (kpr)
February 24, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 35 Motion for Reconsideration re 31 Order is granted in that Timothy Steward shall be reinstated as a deft in this action; pltf's 33 Objections shall be filed as an Amended Complaint against Steward; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 1 33 , and this Order on deft without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/11. (vjt)
February 8, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts Wheeler and Steward are DISMISSED from this action, for failure to state a claim; Steward and Jack Wheeler terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/8/11. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 10 Partial Report and Recommendations; pltf is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the entry of this Order re his claims against defts Ford and Wheeler. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
September 7, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order, and directing the Clerk of the Court to send to plaintiff an ifp application, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poland v Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Frederick Poland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?