Davis v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Gregory Davis
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00271
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 72 Report and Recommendations in favor of Defendant and that Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/22/2012. (pag)
March 2, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correcion to transport the Plaintiff, Gregory Davis, to the Evidentiary Hearing on 03/13/2012 including the Plaintiff's complete institutional file including his medical records. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/02/2012. (kcs)
March 1, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to transport the Plaintiff to the Evidentiary Hearing/Trial scheduled on 03/13/2012 in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/01/2012. (kcs)
September 19, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL, dismissing the Doe Defendants from this action without prejudice, due to lack of service. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/19/11. (vjt)
August 25, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as moot, docket entry # 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff, at his new EARU address, a copy of the documents received pursuant to the July 25, 2011 subpoena duces tecum (docket entry #44); P laintiff shall file, on or before September 8, 2011, a Motion for Service that contains the names of and service addresses for the John Doe Defendants; and Plaintiff is reminded if he fails to timely and properly do so, the John Doe Defendant will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/25/2011. (kcs)
November 22, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; directing the Clerk to add as Defendants "John Does, five unknown officers at the Tucker Maximum Security U nit"; dismissing Defendant Hobbs without prejudice, because Plaintiff has failed to state a claim against him; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/2010. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?