Earls v. Hughes et al

Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
Defendant: Joe Hughes, De Saint Felix, Dorothy Langel, Deborah Louise York, Barnes, Connie Hubbard and Correctional Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv00299
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/29/11. (hph)
August 26, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/26/11. (kpr)
July 1, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 38 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/11. (kpr)
May 11, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying the 9 Motion for TRO filed by Jacob Thomas Earls. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/11/11. (kpr)
November 30, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Joe Hughes, Dr. De-Saint Felix, Dorothy Langel, Deborah Louise York, Dr. Barnes, Connie Hubbard, and Correctional Medical Services, Inc. and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Amen ded Complaint and summons on defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor; and denying plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/10. (bkp) Modified on 11/30/2010 to correct typographical error (bkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earls v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Saint Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Langel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Louise York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?