Elps v. Armstrong et al

Plaintiff: Tommy R Elps
Defendant: Clinton Armstrong, Michael Porter, Mitchell and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv00302
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 68 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, a default judgment in the amount of zero dollars is entered against deft Leon Ester. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/1/11. (vjt)
June 28, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Objections to R&R due 7/15/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/28/11. (vjt)
March 16, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 37 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss defts Mitchell, Michael Angelo Porter, Douglas Williams, Clinton Armstrong and Jackie Lewis without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/11. (vjt)
December 1, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED 12 ORDER, setting aside and replacing 12 Order previously entered 11/29/10; declining to adopt 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Ordering pltf to file an amended complaint as directed within 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/1/10. (vjt)
November 29, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Armstrong and Mitchell are DISMISSED without prejudice; Clinton Armstrong and Mitchell terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/29/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elps v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy R Elps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?