RehabCare Group East Inc v. Davis Nursing Association et al

Plaintiff: RehabCare Group East Inc
Defendant: Davis Nursing Association and Hazel Street Nursing Association
Case Number: 5:2010cv00314
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff, RehabCare Group East, Inc. d/b/a RehabCare Group Therapy Services, Inc., in the amount of $425,000, less any payments made pursuant to a Forbearance Agreement between the parties, plus interest and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/13. (kpr)
October 26, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay and Administratively Close this action; denying as moot 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; this action is hereby administratively terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/26/11. (vjt)
August 31, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery; Discovery due by 9/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RehabCare Group East Inc v. Davis Nursing Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RehabCare Group East Inc
Represented By: Phillip A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Nursing Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Street Nursing Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?