Robinson v. Perkins et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Dominic Robinson
Defendant: Brian Perkins, Antwon Emsweller, Kristie Bailey, Rosalyn Williams, Wade and Darryl Golden
Case Number: 5:2010cv00324
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The parties informed the Court informally on 25 February 2014 that this case had settled. All claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2014. (jak)
February 25, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending 74 Scheduling Order and removing the trial date from the Court's calendar pursuant to the parties settlement. The Court will enter Judgment dismissing all claims against defendants with prejudice unless one of the parties seeks some other action before 7 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/25/2014. (jak)
February 3, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The ADC is further directed to send Robinson's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Robinson to bring any legal papers he wants to court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2014. (ks)
January 31, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of witness Troy Roddy (ADC #103051), East AR Max Unit, at 8:15 a.m. on 02/12/2014 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/31/2014. (rhm)
January 16, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Andrew Dominic Robinson (ADC #652013), Varner SuperMax Unit, at 8:15 a.m. on 12 February2014 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. The Court further directs the Arkansas Department of Correction to send Robinson's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Robinson to bring any legal papers he wants to court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/16/14. (kpr)
December 31, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 MOTION to Continue. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2014. Mr. Howe can try the case for Perkins. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/31/2013. (jak)
May 1, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The January 2014 setting is first out. The Court believes this case can be tried in three days. The Court allots six hours to Robinson for all direct and cross-examination and the same to Perkins. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/13. (kpr)
July 6, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the uncontested parts of the PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 58 ; granting in part and denying in part 33 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brian Perkins. The Court finds that a jury trial will be necessary in this case and recommends that the parties consent to a jury trial before Judge Ray, although this Court will preside, if either party prefers it. Any consent form must be filed by July 30, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/12. (kpr)
January 23, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to 33 , 34 & 35 filed by Brian Perkins, that complay with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/23/2012. (kcs)
August 30, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part docket entry # 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel: (a) Granting in part, such that Defendant Perkins shall file, on or before September 13, 2011, his Answers to Plaintiff's July 3, 2011 Interrogatories; and (b) Denying in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/30/2011. (kcs)
April 7, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, Robinson's request for a temporary restraining order is denied; pltf's claims against Emsweller, Bailey, Williams, Wade, and Golden are dismissed without prejudice; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and complaints 2 6 on deft Perkins; Darryl Golden, Wade, Rosalyn Williams, Kristie Bailey and Antwon Emsweller terminated. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dominic Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwon Emsweller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalyn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?