Brown v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Ray Hobbs, Roger Cameron, Ron Chism, Obadiah Davis, Shantrice Shavers, Arkansas Department of Community Correction, Kent Villines, James L Williams, David Eberhard, Arkansas Board of Pardons & Paroles and John Felts
Case Number: 5:2010cv00326
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 86 Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law, this case is dismissed with prejudice and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/5/2014. (ljb)
October 28, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: The Court determines that neither Mr. Chism nor Ms. Johnson were deliberately indifferent to Mr. Brown's needs, therefore the Court declines to award to Mr. Brown compensatory damages. The Court does not reach the issue of punitive damages. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/28/2014. (ks)
October 17, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Hobbs, Cameron, Davis, Shavers, and Eberhard are dismissed without prejudice based on no exhaustion. Brown may proceed on his deliberate-indiferrence claims against Chism and Johnson, but only in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/11. (kpr)
January 19, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Beth Deere's Partial Recommended Disposition. Brown's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction, the Arkansas Department of Community Correction, the Arkansas Board of Pardons and Parole, and John Felts are dismissed with prejudice. Brown's claims against Villines and Williams are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent his complaint (as supplemented) alleges a race-discrimination claim and a breach-of-confidentiality claim, those claims are also dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/19/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Chism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obadiah Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantrice Shavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Villines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Eberhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Pardons & Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?