Muhammad v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Takbir Allahu Akbar Muhammad
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, D White and B Cervin
Case Number: 5:2010cv00343
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 45 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of David White and Ray Hobbs dismissing the complaint of Takbir Allahu Akbar Muhammad with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/12. (vjt)
August 3, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf shall file a response to defts' 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment as directed within 30 days. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/12. (vjt)
November 16, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, the claims against deft Charles Cervin are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under FRCP 4(m). Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/16/11. (vjt)
August 9, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to, within 45 days, ascertain a valid service address for deft Cervin and to file a "Motion for Service" requesting that serve be attempted upon him at that address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/9/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takbir Allahu Akbar Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Cervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?