Davis v. Contech Construction Products Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jerry K Davis
Defendant: Contech Construction Products Inc, Port City Trucking Inc, Bruce E Lick and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv00349
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Based on the parties' 89 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, the Court dismisses plaintiff's complaint against defendants with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/26/2014. (rhm)
August 13, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial docket for the week of 08/18/2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/13/2014. (rhm)
January 10, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for New Trial date. The Clerk is directed to remove this case from the trial docket for the week of July 28, 2014. A new trial date will be set and a Third Amended Final Scheduling Order will be issued by separate Order, resetting all pretrial deadlines that have not already passed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/14. (kpr)
February 6, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot the Motions to Compel 26 30 ; granting 31 Motion to STAY CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/6/12. (vjt)
August 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 19 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum of separate deft Contech Construction Products Inc, is denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/11. (vjt)
July 7, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 10/1/2011; Motions due by 10/29/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/7/11. (vjt)
December 15, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for Michael D. Ermert 7 and Alva C. Caine 8 to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for pltf in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Contech Construction Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry K Davis
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contech Construction Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port City Trucking Inc
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce E Lick
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?