White v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Lewis J White
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00357
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Reconsideration and withdrawing the referral to Magistrate Judge Ray. The Court sees no need for an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/16/12. (kpr)
June 5, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 30 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/12. (kpr)
May 27, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 13 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/11. (vjt)
May 9, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file the record and appellate briefs in Ark. Ct. App. No. CACR 03-1294. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/09/2011. (ksm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis J White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?