Burks v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: Michael Burks
Defendant: Steve Carter, Ben Hines, Diane Baldwin, McGehee-Desha County Hospital, Oboma Asemota and John Does
Cross_defendant: Oboma Asemota, Steve Carter, Ben Hines, Diane Baldwin and McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Cross_claimant: Oboma Asemota, Diane Baldwin and McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Case Number: 5:2010cv00358
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Diane Baldwin's motion for summary judgment; dismissing Defendant Baldwin with prejudice; and, denying Defendant Obomo Asemota's oral motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/5/2013. (thd)
July 10, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the oral motion of Michael Burks to amend the 1 Complaint and name Diane Baldwin as a deft in her individual capacity. Baldwin has 15 days in which to submit a brief in support of her motion for qualified immunity. Burks shall have 10 days from the filing of Baldwin's brief in which to respond. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/10/12. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 7/10/2012 to correct response deadline.) (thd).
July 6, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing William M. Griffin, Khayyam Eddings, Ben Jackson, Dr. Oboma Asemota, Luther Sutter and Jacob Sutter to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse in Pine Bluff, AR beginning Monday, July 9, 2012, and each day thereafter until the trial is completed, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burks v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Oboma Asemota
Represented By: J. Kendall Cook
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Steve Carter
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ben Hines
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Diane Baldwin
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Oboma Asemota
Represented By: J. Kendall Cook
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Diane Baldwin
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burks
Represented By: B. Dale West
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Carter
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Hines
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Baldwin
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Khayyam Marice Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oboma Asemota
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Represented By: J. Kendall Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?