Henry v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Bobby Don Henry
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00372
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 22 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action in its entirety with prejudice; a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/11. (vjt)
April 25, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 16 Report and Recommendations; Objections to R&R due 5/17/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Petitioner of his opportunity to file, on or before 3/24/11, a reply to 10 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/24/11. (vjt)
January 24, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve, by regular mail, a copy of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bobby Don Henry, 2 Memorandum, and 3 Response, on Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General; Respondent is directed to file an answer within 21 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/24/11. (vjt)
January 3, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to submit either the $5.00 filing fee or the ifp application (enclosed) within 30 days of this Order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/3/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Don Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?