Baker v. Warren et al

Plaintiff: Terrance N Baker
Defendant: Estella Murray, William Warren, Mark Warner and Handley
Case Number: 5:2011cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice, and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/30/11. (hph)
August 17, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 53 proposed findings and recommended disposition in their entirety in all respects; and denying 4 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/17/2011. (kdr)
July 26, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Estella Murray, Handley, William Warren. Plaintiff shall file a response to defts' motion for summary judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/26/11. (kpr)
June 9, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure pltf's attendance, together with a copy of his medical records, at the hearing scheduled for 7/19/11 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
June 6, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 36 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and directing Judge Kearney to schedule a hearing on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/6/11. (kpr)
May 3, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Warner and dismissing deft Warner without prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/3/11. (kpr)
March 8, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to deft Warner's 13 Motion to Dismiss within 15 days of the date of this Order; 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Mark Warner, pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/8/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Dr. William Warren, APN Estella Murray and Nurse Handley, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on defts c/o Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/24/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Warner
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance N Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?