Boyle v. Lay et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Boyle
Defendant: Merlin Fitzpatrick, Gaylon Lay, Vernon Robertson and DeAngelo Earl
Case Number: 5:2011cv00014
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defts Lay and Robertson are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may proceed with his excessive force claim against defts Earl and Fitzpatrick in their individual capacities only. The Court certifies an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/6/12. (kpr)
July 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as specified herein, docket entry # 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/15/2011. (ksm)
February 18, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 3 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's 14th Amendment claims without prejudice. Plaintiff may proceed with his Eighth Amendment claims against defts. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for deft s Lay, Robertson, Earl and Fitzpatrick, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint and this order on them without prepayment of fees therefor. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/18/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. Lay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Robertson
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAngelo Earl
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?