Campbell v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Mark E Campbell
Defendant: Cherya Jones, Darryl Golden, James Banks, Curtis Meizner, Revonna Walker, Grant Harris, John Whalen and Larry May
Case Number: 5:2011cv00021
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 96 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing the complaint of Mark E Campbell. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/12. (vjt)
April 3, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 , 77 , 78 , the Court directs the Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Jugments and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts on or before 04/14/2012. Defendants may, if they choose, file a Reply within 7 days of the filing of the Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/03/2012. (kcs)
October 6, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as specified herein, Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel, (docket entry #31); granting, as specified herein, docket entry # 40 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel; granting, as modified herein, doc ket entry # 47 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; and granting, as modified, herein, docket entry # 48 Defendants' Motion to Take Deposition from Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/06/2011. (kcs)
September 30, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 41 Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/30/11. (vjt)
July 22, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part docket, and held in abeyance in part, as specified in this Order, docket entry # 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/22/2011. (ksm)
March 29, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, deft ADC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf's state law negligence claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf's state battery claim, and Fourteenth Amendment du e process claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf may proceed with his Eighth Amendment failure to protect claims against defts Harris, May, Whalen, Golden, Banks, Meizner, Walker, and Jones; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 7 8 , and this Order on defts without prepayment of fees and costs; Arkansas Department of Correction terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherya Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revonna Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?