Coffey v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Defendant: Deborah York, Ray Hobbs and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2011cv00086
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 57 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
October 27, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/27/11. (kpr)
September 8, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 8 Motion for Relief filed by Kenny Coffey. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Set Aside Order directing defts' response to pltf's motion for injunctive relief. Defendants are directed to respond to pltf's motion within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/.26/11. (kpr)
June 20, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney's partial Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. Coffey's claims against Hobbs are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/11. (hph)
June 9, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to respond to pltf's 8 MOTION for Injunctive Relief and/or Protective Order within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?