Trice v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Ellis Trice
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00087
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 27 Order entered in this case on this date, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/29/2012. (dmn)
May 16, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail. The respondent will file his answer within 20 days after service of the petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/16/11. (kpr)
April 15, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the petitioner to either pay the $5 filing fee or submit the appropriate ifp application within 30 days of the entry-date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to change the respondent to Ray Hobbs and to forward to petitioner a copy of the appropriate ifp application, along with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/15/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trice v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?