Gaston v. Webster et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Gaston
Defendant: Lawrence Webster, James Nowden, Delnor Glenn, Horace Watkins and John Does
Case Number: 5:2011cv00094
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/12. (vjt)
January 12, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defts is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/12/12. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston v. Webster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Gaston
Represented By: Bryan R. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Webster
Represented By: Sara Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nowden
Represented By: Sara Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delnor Glenn
Represented By: Sara Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Watkins
Represented By: Sara Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?