Kelley v. Anderson et al

Plaintiff: James Kelley
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Jacqueline Carswell, Charlotte Green, Sandra Thomas, Correctional Medical Services, Straughn and Anderson
Case Number: 5:2011cv00130
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 96 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant William Straughn, and without prejudice in all other respects; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/13/2012. (dmn)
February 24, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 69 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 62 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charlotte Green, Roland Anderson, Corizon Inc, Jacqueline Carswell, and Sandra Thomas, is GRANTED; pltf's claims against them are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Corizon Inc, Charlotte Green, Sandra Thomas, Roland Anderson and Jacqueline Carswell terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/12. (vjt)
September 22, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's Motions 43 to Appoint Counsel and 44 for Medical Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/22/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?