Moore v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Ramon Moore
Defendant: Stuart Campbell, McKinze, Mary Moore, Charlotte Green, Rhonda Mitchell and Jacqueline Carswell
Case Number: 5:2011cv00137
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 70 Order of Dismissal entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/23/12. (vjt)
February 14, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting pltf's request to voluntarily dismiss deft Campbell; and denying the 33 Motion for Leave to File filed by Timothy Ramon Moore. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/14/12. (kpr)
January 12, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/12/2012. (kcs)
September 12, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Timothy Ramon Moore. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/12/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ramon Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?