Conway v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: |
Byron L Conway |
Defendant: |
Wendy Kelley, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs and Correctional Medical Services Inc |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv00142 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Pine Bluff Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
James M. Moody |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Thomas Ray |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 29, 2012 |
Filing
45
JUDGMENT in favor of the defendants and against plaintiff re 44 Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/12. (kpr)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/28/12. (kpr)
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER Plaintiff is directed to file within 30 days a Response to 30 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wendy Kelley. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the f acts set forth in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(a); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/16/2012. (kcs)
|
April 10, 2012 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying 25 Motion to Compel; granting 27 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant is directed to file any dispositive motions on or before 04/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/10/2012. (kcs)
|
October 21, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 and denying the Motion 11 to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Wendy Kelley. Deft shall file an Answer within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/21/11. (kpr)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDER, Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, a Response to docket entry # 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Wendy Kelley. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/23/2011. (kcs)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff's constitutional and pendent state law claims against defts CMS, Norris, and Hobbs. Pltf's request for monetary damages against deft Kelley, in her official capacity only, is dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff shall proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against deft Kelley in her official capacity for injunctive and declaratory relief, and in her individual capacity for monet ary damages. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for deft Kelley and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order on her through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/11. (kpr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?