Russell v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Russell
Defendant: Robert Ware, Connie Hubbard, Shirley Banes, Wendy Kelly, David Ware, Richard Anderson, Anderson, Rolland Anderson, Correctional Medical Services and Richard Pritchard
Case Number: 5:2011cv00159
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 92 Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/20/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 MOTION to Compel filed by Isaac Russell. The Motion to Compel should be re-docketed as a Notice to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/11. (kpr)
December 15, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Robert Ware is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; Richard Pritchard is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice; David Ware is re-instated as a deft ; granting deft Kelley's 26 Motion to Dismiss; Kelley is dismissed from this action without prejudice; the Medical Defts' 50 Motion for Order Revoking pltf's ifp status is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
November 4, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Amend/Correct Order; granting 52 Motion to Stay Discovery; and ordering Plaintiff to file a Response to Defts' Motion for Order Revoking Plaintiff's ifp status within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/4/11. (kpr)
October 5, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 MOTION to Stay Discovery pending resolution of her Motion to Dismiss filed by deft Wendy Kelley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/5/11. (vjt)
September 30, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf one last opportunity to provide a present address on defts Richard Pritchard and Robert Ware within 30 days of the date of this Order; failure to provide such or obtain service on these defts may result in their dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/11. (vjt)
September 9, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to complete discovery on or before March 7, 2012, and file any dispositive motions on or before April 7, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/9/11. (kpr)
August 1, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing defts Dr. Anderson, Dr. Richard Anderson, and Dr. David Ware from pltf's complaint, pltf having amended his complaint to identify the proper defts; David Ware, Anderson and Richard Anderson terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/1/11. (vjt)
July 29, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that service is appropriate for defts Correctional Medical Services, Richard Pritchard, Shirley Barnes, Wendy Kelly, Connie Hubbard, Rolland Anderson, and Robert Ware. The Clerk shall issue summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of th e Amended Complaint and summons on deft Kelly in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550 without prepayment of costs. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts Correction al Medical Services, Richard Pritchard, Shirley Barnes, Connie Hubbard, Rolland Anderson, and Robert Ware, in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees. The Clerk is directed to correct the name of deft Shirley Barnes. The motion to Appoint Counsel (6) filed by Isaac Russell is denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?