Berger v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Defendant: Does, Steve Outlaw, William Straughn, Grant Harris, Marvin Evans, Ray Hobbs, Dedrick Mustful and S Mathews
Case Number: 5:2011cv00171
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 70 Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/27/2014. (ks)
August 22, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Michael J. Knollmeyer to represent plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of t his Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/22/12. (kpr)
February 15, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Hearing; denying 34 Motion for Recusal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/15/12. (kpr)
January 27, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Compel 25 , with respect to his request for a list of the books in the Maximum Security Unit library and denied in all other respects. Defts are directed to forward to Pltf a copy of his request within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/27/12. (kpr)
November 1, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER adopting 11 Partial Report and Recommendations as stated herein; therefore, Berger's first four claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/11. (vjt)
October 5, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Outlaw, Straughn, Evans and Hobbs. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and complaint on defts in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/5/11. (kpr)
August 30, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf one final opportunity to submit an amended Complaint as directed, within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedrick Mustful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?