Ratchford et al v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Desmond Cunningham, Jeffrey Scott Ratchford, Charles E Butler and Robert Heffernan
Defendant: Barbara Smallwood, J Banks, Gladys M Evans and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00180
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 158 Order dismissing plaintiffs' complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/12. (kpr)
March 2, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 98 MOTION for Order for Restoration of Files filed by pltf. The Court directs pltf Ratchford to supplement his motion within 10 days of the date of this Order to identify the documents which he seeks to retrieve from the IWPS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/2/12. (kpr)
January 23, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Intervene by inmate Gary Gardner; denying 83 Motion to Compel; denying 86 Motion for Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/23/12. (vjt)
January 13, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 75 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying motions (6)(14)(30). Document No. 43 is granted in part and denied in part, and the motion for class certification (21) is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/12. (kpr)
November 2, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Ray Hobbs and James Banks to bring cell phones, and Daniel Potter to bring a cell phone and laptop computer, into the courthouse for the motions hearing set for Thursday, November 3, 2011 at 9:30 a.m., subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/11. (kpr)
September 9, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to respond within 15 days of the date of this order to 30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 21 MOTION to Certify Class 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft James Banks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/9/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratchford et al v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Ratchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Heffernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?