Howard v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Curtis Ray Howard
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00196
Filed: August 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/12. (vjt)
August 21, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 27 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action without prejudice, so that petitioner may seek authorization from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals, to file a successive habeas petition. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/12. (vjt)
January 6, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Petitioner's Motion for Default Judgment; granting 9 Petitioner's Motion for Copies and directing the Respondent to file a responsive pleading to the Petition 1 on or before 01/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/06/2012. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Ray Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?