Jones v. Robertson et al

Plaintiff: Walter Phillip Jones
Defendant: Vernon R Robertson, Cindy Courington and Minnie L Drayer
Case Number: 5:2011cv00211
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 64 Order dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/28/13. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 49 Motion to Compel; granting pltf's 55 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 9/12/12 to respond to defts' 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/13/12. (vjt)
January 30, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Cindy Courington and Minnie L Drayer are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/12. (vjt)
November 29, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 5 , pltf's response 14 , and this Order on defts Straughn, Burl, Wood, McConnell, Robertson, Cook, and Banks without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claim regarding his disciplinary conviction and the failure to follow ADC policy are DISMISSED with prejudice; his claim that deft Courington violated his fifth amendment right against self-incrimination is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/13/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Phillip Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon R Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnie L Drayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?