Marshall v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Lee Marshall
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Revonna Walker, Gladys Evans, Grant Harris, John Whaley, James Banks, Greg Harmon, Moses Jackson, Does, George Brewer and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2011cv00239
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 98 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 88 the defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing this case, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/18/2013. (kdr)
April 16, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gladys Evans, James Banks, Revonna Walker, Moses Jackson, Greg Harmon, Wendy Kelley, Ray Hobbs, Larry Norris, John Whaley, Grant Harris, George Brewer. Plaintiff is directed to, within 15 days, file a response to defts' motion for summary judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/16/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/7/13. (kpr)
January 4, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 70 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, TRO, and Preliminary Injunction, which is construed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/4/13. (vjt)
July 16, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended disposition; dismissing 1 Thomas's petition for writ of habeas corpus. A certificate of appealability will not be issued because Thomas has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/16/12. (hph)
January 17, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defts' 36 MOTION to Stay Discovery, pending resolution of their Motions to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (vjt)
October 26, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft John Whaley, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/26/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revonna Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Lee Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?