Anderson v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: James Ken Anderson
Defendant: John Lytle, Deb York, Ray Hobbs, Ray Naylor, Wendy Kelly, Larry May, Grant Harris and Roland Anderson
Case Number: 5:2011cv00258
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 273 Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' motions for summary judgment 253 257 are GRANTED, and pltf's claims are dismissed; pltf's 263 Motion for Sanctions and 272 Motion for Order are denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/20/13. (vjt)
September 4, 2012 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 244 Request is granted, service is waived, and Dr. Lytle is deemed served on this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/4/12. (vjt)
August 3, 2012 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 213 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 197 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/12. (vjt)
July 31, 2012 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's motions to amend his complaint 226 231 236 ; Anderson is prohibited from filing any further motions to amend or motions to supplement his complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/12. (vjt)
July 9, 2012 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 219 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/9/12. (kpr)
July 6, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 230 Motion for Reconsideration. The defendants have 14 days to respond to Mr. Anderson's two motions for order to file a supplemental pleading (docket entries 226 and 231). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/6/12. (kpr)
May 29, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 209 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations; Roland Anderson's Motion to Dismiss 160 and pltf's 179 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/12. (vjt)
May 24, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 173 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 156 Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/12. (vjt)
March 6, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion to Produce; denying 118 Motion for Discovery; denying 120 Motion to Produce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/6/12. (kpr)
February 23, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Relief; denying 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 55 Motion to Compel; denying 72 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 75 Motion for Joinder; denying 77 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 94 Motion for Leave to File; denying 96 Motion for Leave to File; denying 101 Motion for Leave to File; denying 102 Motion to Extend Time; denying 104 Motion for Leave to File; denying 105 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 105 Motion for Relief; denying 106 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/12. (kpr)
December 7, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft York are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 8 19 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ken Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?