Jones v. Evergreen Packaging Inc

Plaintiff: Oren H Jones
Defendant: Evergreen Packaging Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv00259
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, the Court finds that this case should be dismissed. the complaint and all claims in this action against the defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice.T he Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/2015. (ks)
July 20, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has determined that the jury trial will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Monday August 3, 2015, in Courtroom #3602, George Howard, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 East 8th, Pine Bluff, Arkansas. Counsel and parties should be present by 8:30 A.M. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/20/2015. (jak)
January 18, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Evergreen Packaging Inc against Oren H Jones re 37 Order dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/13. (kpr)
May 11, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/12. (vjt)
March 29, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot deft's 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Evergreen Packaging Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oren H Jones
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Packaging Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?