Scott v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Willie Scott, Jr
Defendant: Jimmy Coleman, IV, C Rayner and A Weekly
Case Number: 5:2011cv00269
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 51 Memorandum & Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/24/2013. (srw)
February 8, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; and denying without prejudice 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/8/2013. (srw)
January 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for Defendant Weekly; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 6 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and summons on this Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/7/2013. (srw)
January 17, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 12 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Coleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Rayner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?