Smith v. Watson Chapel School District

Plaintiff: Mark Leon Essex Smith
Defendant: Watson Chapel School District
Case Number: 5:2011cv00272
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Watson Chapel School District against Mark Leon Essex Smith re 48 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/26/12. (kpr)
October 31, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/12. (kpr)
March 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Watson Chapel's request that the Clerk be directed to file under seal any documents designated as "Confidential: File Under Seal". Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/12. (vjt)
January 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/5/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Watson Chapel School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Chapel School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Leon Essex Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?