Dodds v. Correctional Medical Services

Plaintiff: John E Dodds
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2011cv00291
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Dodds's claims against St. Vincent Health System, Dr. Jonak, Dr. Ligget, Corizon Inc., Dream Redick-Young, Dr. Deborah York, Dr. Shirley Barnes, and Beverly Simmons. Dodds's claim against Dr. Houston is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2014. (jak)
July 9, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 169 Motion to Seal. Dr. Houston may file Dodd's medical records under seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2014. (jak)
March 13, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 154 Final Scheduling Order. The 7 April 2014 trial is cancelled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. There will be a short window for discovery and a new dispositive-motion deadline, so that this older case can be resolved sooner rather than later. The Court requests that counsel make this matter a priority. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/2014. (jak)
January 3, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 164 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with a note. Dodds's claims against Simmons are dismissed without prejudice. The note: his claims against Corizon, Inc. were dismissed by previous 162 Order. Dr. Houston is now the sole Defendant in the case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/3/2014. (jak)
August 6, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 159 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, granting defendants' 149 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Dream Redick-Young, Deborah York and Dr. Shirley Barnes are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Samuel Houston and Beverly Simmons remain. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2013. (mcz)
January 8, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 129 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/13. (kpr)
November 15, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 113 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Dodds's claims against Simmons are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2012. (mcz)
September 5, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 91 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Jonak, Ligget, and Houston without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/5/12. (kpr)
July 31, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 Judge Deere's Partial Report and Recommendations as this Court's decision; denying 65 Dodds's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2012. (dmn)
June 1, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 57 the proposed Partial Recommended Disposition; and, denying 49 Corizon's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2012. (kdr)
April 23, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against St. Vincent without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/12. (kpr)
April 16, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Pursuant to Dodds's notice of change of address, the Clerk is directed to mail copies of Magistrate Judge Deere's April 2nd Order and Partial Recommended Disposition to Dodds at his new EARU address. Plaintiff's time to object to the 33 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS is extended until April 30, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/12. (kpr)
March 6, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Dream Young, Dr. Jonak, Ms. York, Beverly Simmons, Dr. Ligget, Dr. Barnes, and Dr. Houston. All defts except for deft Houston should be served through Correctional Medical Services, Inc. in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 72612. Service for deft Houston should be through St. Vincent Infirmary, Two St. Vincent Circle, Little Rock, AR 72205. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds v. Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Dodds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?