Mosby v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Roger D Mosby
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2011cv00301
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 55 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/12. (vjt)
January 26, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Medical Examination; denying 25 Motion to Stay Case; denying, as moot 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying, as moot 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/26/2012. (kcs)
January 5, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying docket entry # 10 and # 14 Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/05/2011. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosby v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?