Vanzant v. Morris et al

Plaintiff: Mark Edward Vanzant
Defendant: V Brooks, S Outlaw, B Montgomery, A Morris, W Turner, D Parker, Jerry S Jacks, Charles D Sanders and S Perez
Case Number: 5:2012cv00021
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all of his claims against defts Sandra Perez-Crawford, Eddie Turner, and Charlotte Sanders, and all of his official capacity claims; and without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/27/13. (vjt)
February 8, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 36 Partial Report and Recommendations; defts' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; pltf's claims of inadequate medical care are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pl tf's claims re food contamination are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the exception of his individual-capacity claims against defts Eddie Turner and Charlotte Sanders; pltf's claims against defts in their official capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/13. (vjt)
June 22, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 Partial Report and Recommendations. The motion filed by Defendant Sandra Perez-Crawford 19 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff's claims against Perez-Crawford are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Perez-Crawford's name is removed as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/22/2012. (pag)
February 24, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct names of defts Artie Morris, Dustin Parker, Barbara Montgomery, Steve Outlaw, Velma Brooks, Charlotte Sanders, Eddie Turner, and Sandra Perez; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on deft Perez, in care of counsel for the prison's medical contractor, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/24/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanzant v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry S Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edward Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?