Jones v. Corizon Inc

Plaintiff: Linda Jones
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00057
Filed: February 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit the appropriate filings to permit this Court to evaluate the settlement. The Court must approve the settlement before entering an order of dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/12/13. (kpr)
April 16, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 99 Joint MOTION to Continue (Joint Motion for Order Setting Scheduling Conference, for Entry of Amended Scheduling Order, and to Continue Trial Date) filed by Corizon Inc. The Court will conduct a scheduling conference by telephone on the parties' joint motion on April 22, 2013, beginning at 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/16/13. (kpr)
December 7, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney AMBER SCHUBERT AS NAMED COUNSEL filed by Joyce Forte, Anthony Ross, Annette Pickens, Barbara Ragland, Gwendolyn Jones, Dorothy Davis, Patricia Robbins, Latunya Crane, Angela Tatum, Linda Jones, Lashunda Jones, Savannah Fluker, Pearlie Holmes, Janice Lambert, Tracy Starks, Toni Thomas, Regina Curtis, Vernita Jones, Winona Robinson. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jones
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?