St Christopher v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Lorne St Christopher
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv00058
Filed: February 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the parties 104 joint stipulation of dismissal. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/18/2014. (rhm)
May 27, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Compel. The Court finds that these materials will be produced within five days of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/27/2014. (rhm)
February 4, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Clarify. Defendant shall have up to and including 03/21/2014 to respond. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/04/2014. (rhm)
May 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/21/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Christopher v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Andrew W. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorne St Christopher
Represented By: Chester H. Lauck, III
Represented By: Herbert Emerson Christy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?