Avery v. Cashion et al

Plaintiff: Robert William Avery
Defendant: Mark Cashion, J M Davis, Lillie F Phillips and Larry L Manning
Case Number: 5:2012cv00062
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re the Court's Orders 128 129 . Plaintiff Robert William Avery's claims against defendants in their official capacities for monetary damages and claim for injunctive relief are dismissed with prejudice and the remainder of Mr. Avery's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/1/13.(kpr)
September 30, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 126 and dismissing 2 Complaint and 23 Amended Complaint filed by Robert William Avery without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
August 7, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit the $350 filing fee, or a complete IFP application (enclosed), no later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/7/12. (vjt)
March 12, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Jesse Davis; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on deft Davis (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/12/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Cashion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillie F Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?